+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 21, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0093)
On March 16, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 93 (effective 3/16/94)
On March 6, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB23ER)
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD8812198 (HB23H1)
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg. clause, pref. 01/11/94
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1994: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1994: Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor