+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 500 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB2297ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105366D-S1 (94-Y 3-N)
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2297S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105366D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 11105366D-S1
- Reported from Local Government with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Committee substitute rejected 11105100D-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11105100D-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100610D
+ − Votes (9)
February 22, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
February 18, 2011: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N)
February 18, 2011: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 2-N)
February 17, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Reported from Local Government with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
February 8, 2011: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2011: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor