+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 586 (effective 7/1/19)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586)
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2297ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 19106590D-S1 (100-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106590D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2297S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19106590D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Referred from Finance by voice vote
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103220D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2019: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2019: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
February 1, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2019: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor