+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (68)
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0794)
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (31-Y 9-N)
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Pending question ordered
- Enacted, Chapter 794 (effective - see bill)
- VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 42-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (52-Y 42-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2294ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 23107774D-H3
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 13, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2294ER)
On February 24, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (85-Y 9-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (85-Y 9-N)
- Conference substitute printed 23107328D-H2
- Amended by conference committee
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 17-N)
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senators: Hanger, Favola, Ebbin
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Kilgore, Leftwich, Herring
- House acceded to request
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (31-Y 66-N 1-A)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 23106591D-S1 (31-Y 66-N 1-A)
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute from Finance and Appropriations is ruled out of order 23106859D-S2
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 23106591D-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N)
- Defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2294S1
- Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 23106859D-S2
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 4-N 1-A)
On February 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 23106591D-S1
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (91-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 7-N)
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2294H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 23106339D-H1
On February 5, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 23106339D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 3-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
- Reconsidered by Courts of Justice
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Failed to report refer to Appropriations (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 11-N)
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
On January 28, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101465D