+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 31, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638)
On March 25, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 638 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2293ER)
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to LD2294701-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD2294701-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD2294701-S1
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to General Laws
On February 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Motion to pass by for the day rejected (48-Y 52-N)
- Motion to reconsider engrossment rejected (48-Y 50-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (48-Y 50-N)
- Motion for Pending question agreed to
- VOTE: BILL BY FOR DAY (48-Y 52-N)
- Passed House (95-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD7751812-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (18-Y 2-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed LD7751812
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
February 21, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1995: Reported from General Laws with sub. (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1995: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (48-Y 50-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: BILL BY FOR DAY (48-Y 52-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from General Laws with amds. (18-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor