+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 125 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2291ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2291H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104472D-H1
- Read second time
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11104472D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: #2 Students and Daycare
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102125D
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2011: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2011: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor