+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 564 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2291ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N 2-A)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (92-Y 1-N 2-A)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Amendment by Senator Wagner agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 3-N)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N 2-A)
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 3-N 2-A)
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 17103327D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2291E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (19-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 17103327D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N 2-A)
February 16, 2017: Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 3-N)
February 15, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2017: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N 2-A)
January 19, 2017: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor