+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On April 9, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809)
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2290ER2)
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 809 (effective 7/1/01)
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (23-Y 15-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (23-Y 15-N)
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2001 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2290ER)
On February 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 24, 2001 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Senate amendments accepted by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Mims, Edwards, Quayle
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Barlow, Brink, Rhodes
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Senate amendments rejected by House (2-Y 96-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds (11-Y 2-N 2-A)
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 015409620-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (20-Y 2-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 015409620
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (11)
April 4, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
April 4, 2001: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (23-Y 15-N)
February 24, 2001: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT. (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2001: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds (11-Y 2-N 2-A)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
February 4, 2001: Reported from C. J. with amendments (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor