+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0750)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 750 (effective 7/1/22)
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 8-N)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Reenrolled
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (54-Y 45-N)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Pass by for the day not agreed to (19-Y 21-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N)
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled bill text (HB229ER2)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB229ER)
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 22106488D-S1 (96-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106488D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB229S1
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 22106488D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB229H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105927D-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22105927D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N)
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101594D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (13)
April 27, 2022: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 8-N)
April 27, 2022: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N)
April 27, 2022: Pass by for the day not agreed to (19-Y 21-N)
April 27, 2022: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 45-N)
March 7, 2022: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2022: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2022: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2022: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2022: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor