+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 10, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0096)
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 96 (effective 7/1/95)
On February 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2286ER)
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Trans./Special Grants
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed LD7691126