+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Incorporated by Tra. (HB1730-Albo) by voice vote
On January 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 039365720-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 039365720-H1
- Read second time
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 039365720-H1
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 034875720