+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0767)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 767 (effective 7/1/15)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
- Speaker ruled Governor's recommendation not germane
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 15105725D-H1
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB2286ER)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2286ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 35-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (65-Y 35-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with amendments (24-Y 16-N)
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 3-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N)
- Read third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 5-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 15104052D