+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 22, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
On March 18, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 394 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2285ER)
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD4990350-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to LD4990350-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD4990350-H1
- Reported from R. & I. N. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to R. & I. N. sub-committee: 4
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed LD0123350