+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (56)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 812 (effective 7/1/09)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2285ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 7, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 095876802-H2
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2285ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate receded from amendment (38-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- REJECTED (3-Y 93-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (3-Y 93-N)
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 092936216-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 by Senator Norment withdrawn
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator Cuccinelli agreed to 092936216-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendment HB2285S1
- Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Amendment #2 by Senator Norment agreed to
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 092936216-S1 (Cuccinelli)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2285H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 092432464-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 092432464-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight & Government Activities (Landes)
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Science and Technology (19-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 092571572
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (12)
April 8, 2009: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 8, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2009: VOTE: --- REJECTED (3-Y 93-N)
February 26, 2009: Senate receded from amendment (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2009: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2009: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2009: Reported from Science and Technology (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor