+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 8, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0862)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 862 (effective 7/1/97)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's rec. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2284ER)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 8, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2284ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Amendments by Mr. Jones, J. C. agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed (98-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 971547312-E
- Passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
On January 17, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 971547312
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (8)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
April 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1997: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (14-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1997: Reported from C. J. with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor