+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 600 (effective 7/1/13)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0600)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2280ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 13105209D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105209D-S1
- Read third time
- Amendment by Senator Locke agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB2280S1
- Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 2-N)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13105209D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 13104131D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 21, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2013: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (38-Y 2-N)
February 19, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2013: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2013: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor