+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 749 (effective 7/1/09)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2277ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- Passed by for the day
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 098329436-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2277E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: 1
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 098329436
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 098329436