+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On March 25, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0724)
On March 22, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 724 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1997 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2275ER)
On February 21, 1997 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (90-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 6-N)
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 978495260-H2
- Conference substitute printed 978495260-H2
On February 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONFERENCE COMMITTEE RPT (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 95-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (0-Y 95-N)
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Senators: Miller, K.G., Barry, Gartlan
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Hall, Robinson, Rhodes
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 8-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 978470260-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 978470260-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 978470260-H1
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub. (20-Y 2-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 17, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 973663260
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
February 21, 1997: VOTE: CONFERENCE COMMITTEE RPT (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 6-N)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (0-Y 95-N)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1997: Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 8-N)
January 30, 1997: Reported from Finance with sub. (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor