+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (10-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 15102980D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2274E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (14-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 15102980D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2015: Stricken at request of Patron in Commerce and Labor (10-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 5, 2015: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 1-N)
February 3, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor