+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 22, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0463)
On March 20, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 463 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2272ER)
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 015952936-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 17, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 16, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 015952936