+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 13, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0938)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Bill became law, Chapter 938 (effective 7/1/99)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE-ENROLLED BILL (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed in enrolled form (38-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 26-N)
- Passed in enrolled form (69-Y 26-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (26-Y 72-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (26-Y 72-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Placed on Calendar
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2271ER)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (23-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to L. & C. sub-committee: 1
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 993731376
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE-ENROLLED BILL (38-Y 0-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (26-Y 72-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 26-N)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1999: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1999: Reported from Labor and Commerce (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor