+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 315 (effective - see bill)
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2270ER)
- Enrolled
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 13103772D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2270E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: #1
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed 13103772D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 12, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2013: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2013: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor