+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0105)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 105 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2270ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2270H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 093273687-H1
- Read second time
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 093273687-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 093251687
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2009: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor