+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- (66 affirmative votes required to override veto)
- VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (50-Y 48-N)
- House sustained Governor's veto (50-Y 48-N)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2270ER)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N)
- Read third time and passed House (51-Y 46-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 19102731D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2270E
- Committee amendment Courts of Justice agreed to
- Committee amendments from Militia, Police and Public Safety agreed to
- Read second time
On February 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 7-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (11-Y 9-N)
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N)
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102731D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
April 3, 2019: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (50-Y 48-N)
February 18, 2019: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
February 15, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N)
February 5, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N)
February 1, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 7-N)
January 28, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
January 17, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor