+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
- Read third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N)
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2270H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 23105821D-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 23105821D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N)
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
On January 28, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102087D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 16, 2023: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
February 7, 2023: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
February 3, 2023: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N)
January 30, 2023: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor