+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 9 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/15/17
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2018
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB227ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18106639D-S1 (97-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106639D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB227S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106639D-S1
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB227E
- Printed as engrossed 18102229D-E
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On December 29, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102229D
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Votes (7)
February 8, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
February 6, 2018: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
January 18, 2018: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor