+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2265H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104844D-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 15104844D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Referred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented and ordered printed 15102968D