+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- No further action taken
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stanley, Edwards, Reeves
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 1-N)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 15105206D-S1 (1-Y 98-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2263S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105206D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15105206D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 2-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2263H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104797D-H1
- Read second time
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104797D-H1
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #2
On January 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented and ordered printed 15103882D
+ − Votes (8)
February 25, 2015: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 1-N)
February 24, 2015: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N)
February 23, 2015: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N)
February 20, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 2-N)
February 10, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor