+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0831)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 831 (effective 7/1/19)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2263ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2263ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 19107279D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2263S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19107279D-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19107279D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to General Laws and Technology
- Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2263H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105723D-H1
- Read second time
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19105723D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102473D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 3, 2019: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
April 3, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2019: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2019: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2019: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor