+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0686)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 686 (effective 7/1/17)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2262ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Cox, Greason, Torian
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senators: Newman, Saslaw, Chase
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 17105591D-S1 (0-Y 100-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 17105591D-S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2262S1
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 17105591D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2262H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104913D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17104913D-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100631D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (13)
February 24, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2017: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2017: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2017: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N)
February 21, 2017: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2017: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2017: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2017: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2017: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor