+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 21102559D