+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 5, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 151 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB226ER)
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD4025358 (HB226E)
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 7-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 17, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
February 14, 1994: Reported from C. J. with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor