+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1999 in Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 987056180-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 987056180-H1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 987056180-H1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 988855180
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor