+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 17, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0763)
On April 11, 1995 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2256ER)
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 763 (effective 7/1/95)
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMMEND. (39-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On March 27, 1995 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2256ER)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed LD3592112
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMMEND. (39-Y 0-N)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1995: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor