+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 16, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 446 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2255ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2255H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104546D-H1
- Read second time
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104546D-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance Subcommittee
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 13103398D
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor