+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
On March 26, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 726 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2255ER)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (97-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 010246996-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 010246996-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 010246996-H1
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub (25-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to C. I. B. sub-committee: 2
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 010186540
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2001: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2001: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor