+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0594)
On March 24, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 594 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2250ER)
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 4-N)
- Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from R. & S. S. (14-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 37-N)
- Read third time and passed House (61-Y 37-N)
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 011154832-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 011154832-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with sub (23-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed 011154832-H1
On January 15, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 3
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 010532708
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 4-N)
February 19, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: Reported from R. & S. S. (14-Y 1-N)
February 1, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 37-N)
January 29, 2001: Reported from General Laws with sub (23-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor