+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Incorporated by Appropriations (HB2324-Lingamfelter) by voice vote
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB2324-Lingamfelter) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Referred from Education by voice vote
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: #4 Higher Education and Arts
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102573D
+ − Vote
February 2, 2011: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB2324-Lingamfelter) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor