+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 2, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0545)
On March 27, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 545 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2250ER)
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (30-Y 0-N 8-A)
- Passed Senate (30-Y 0-N 8-A)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (35-Y 0-N 5-A)
- Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N 5-A)
- Read third time
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N 2-A)
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 993367492-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 993367492-H1
- Read second time
On January 27, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 993367492-H1
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (25-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 993347492