+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0033)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 33 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2249ER)
- Enrolled
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed 13101443D
+ − Votes (6)
February 7, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor