+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 595 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2246ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 19-N)
- Read third time and passed House (81-Y 19-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2246H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104625D-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104625D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 6-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed 13101727D
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2013: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 19-N)
January 31, 2013: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor