+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 313 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2245ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 13103287D