+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 466 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2243ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 092930260-S1 (100-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2243S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 092930260-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 092930260-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2243E
- Printed as engrossed 098560428-E
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendments (23-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight & Government Activities (Landes)
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 098560428
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 23, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2009: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2009: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (23-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor