+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103087D
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2017: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor