+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 373 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2237ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2237H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 091834584-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 091834584-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
- Assigned GL sub: FOIA
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 090502760
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 20, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2009: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2009: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2009: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor