+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 741 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2236ER)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 032929211-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 032929211-H1
- Read second time
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 032929211-H1
- Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 036284211