+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 334 (effective 7/1/21)
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2234ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Agreed To (98-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- Amended by conference committee
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Edwards, McClellan, Stuart
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Delegates: Brewer, Convirs-Fowler, Delaney
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 21200467D-S1 (1-Y 96-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Floor substitute printed 21200467D-S1 (Edwards)
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB2234S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Substitute by Senator agreed to 21200467D-S1
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2234H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103605D-H1
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 21103605D-H1
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101740D