+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Transportation (May)
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Referred from Transportation by voice vote
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #3 (Carrico)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 078003436
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor