+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0719)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 719 (effective 7/1/13)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2231ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Rush, Anderson, Howell, A.T.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senators: Newman, McWaters, Locke
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 100-N)
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 13103712D-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB2231E
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed 13103712D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
February 23, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2013: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2013: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2013: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N)
February 14, 2013: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2013: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor