+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 499 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2231ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2231H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104682D-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17104682D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103800D
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 2017: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor